McHugh, Sean Michael (CPSO#: 51104)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2000
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Jul 2000
Summary:

On July 28, 2000, the Discipline Committee heard Dr. McHugh s plea of guilty and found him 
guilty of professional misconduct re: sexual abuse of a patient and ordered the following penalty: 
 
1) revocation of certificate of registration 
2) reprimand to be recorded on the register 
3) that Dr. McHugh reimburse the College for funding provided to the patient under the program 
required under section 85.7.  
 
On August 16, 2005, the Discipline Committee made the decision to direct the Registrar to 
reinstate Dr. McHugh s certificate of registration subject to the following terms, conditions and 
limitations: 
       
   1.    Dr. McHugh will limit his practice to clinical settings that are either team-based or, in 
         which other physicians also practice.  In non-team based setting, there shall be either 
         a physician or an administrative staff person in the same office setting while Dr. 
         McHugh sees patients; 
       
   2.    Dr.  McHugh  will  cause  workplace  monitor(s)  acceptable  to  the  College,  in  each 
         setting  in  which  he  practices,  to  execute  an  undertaking  (in  the  form  attached  as 
         Schedule A  to the order), prior to commencing work in any such setting; 
    
   3.    At least once per month, Dr. McHugh shall see a psychiatrist who is acceptable to the 
         College,  for  treatment  as  required.    Dr.  McHugh  shall  comply  with  all  treatment 
         recommendations of his psychiatrist; 
 
   4.    Dr. McHugh shall cause his treating psychiatrist to execute an undertaking, (in the 
         form attached as Schedule B  to the order), within thirty (30) days of the date of this 
         order; 
 
   5.    If a person who has given an undertaking in the form of a Schedule to this Order is 
         unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. McHugh shall, within 30 days, 
         obtain  an  undertaking  in  the  same  form  from  a  similarly  qualified  person  who  is 
         acceptable to the College; 
 
   6.    If any of the reports of the workplace monitor(s) or psychiatrist are not delivered or 
         are unsatisfactory to the College, the Registrar may suspend Dr. McHugh s certificate 
         of registration; 
 
   7.    Dr.  McHugh  shall  undergo  and  successfully  complete  to  the  satisfaction  of  the 
         College  an  assessment  under  the  direction  of  the  College  in  each  of  his  practice 
         settings within twelve (12) months of his return to practice.  The assessment will be 
         at  Dr.  McHugh s  expense  and  may  include,  among  other  things,  an  observation 
         component, consultation with his workplace monitor(s) and his treating psychiatrist, 
         and  a  chart  review.    Dr.  McHugh  shall  comply  with  any  recommendations  of  the 
         College that result from the assessment;  
 
8.    In the event that Dr. McHugh is unsuccessful in the completion of the assessment or 
      in  complying  with  any  recommendations  that  result  from  the  assessment  as 
      determined  by  the College, the Registrar may suspend Dr. McHugh s certificate of 
      registration  until  he  successfully  completes  the  assessment  or  complies  with  the 
      recommendations; 
              
9.    Dr. McHugh shall pay to the College $2,750.00 to satisfy an outstanding costs order.  
      Such amount shall be paid within six months of the date of this order; and; 
              
10.   Dr. McHugh shall not apply to vary any of the terms of this order until at least two (2) 
      years have passed from the date of this order. 
 
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 28, 2000

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 16 Aug 2005
Decision: Application Accepted