McIlraith, Duncan Mcleod (CPSO#: 33618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: (613) 907-8003
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Division of Neurology
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Duncan McIlraith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McIlraith ( CPSO# 33618 )

Business Address:
The Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUNCAN MCLEOD MCILRAITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCILRAITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989