McIlreath, Sean Alexander (CPSO#: 70237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 359
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 961-0817
Fax: (613) 961-0903
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sean McIlreath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McIlreath ( CPSO# 70237 )

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare Corp
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 961-0817

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN ALEXANDER MCILREATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCILREATH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001