McInnes, Craig Martin (CPSO#: 59575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 Dundas Street East
Suite 302
Belleville ON  K8N 5K6
Phone: (613) 967-4399
Fax: (613) 967-8321
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Craig McInnes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McInnes ( CPSO# 59575 )

Business Address:
302-205 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A2
Phone Number: (613) 967-4399

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 15 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG MARTIN MCINNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINNES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1989