McInnes, James Alexander Esling (CPSO#: 107119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
600 University ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 4611
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ALEXANDER ESLING MCINNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINNES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015