McInnes, Natalia (CPSO#: 84491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: Yakubovich, Natalia (used until: 05 Nov 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main St. West
HSC 3V51
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73794
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIA MCINNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINNES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009