McIntosh, Glenda June (CPSO#: 29900)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 06 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McIntosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Whitby Clinic 200 Brock Street North Whitby ON L1N 4H5
Date Received: 06 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jan 2017