McIntosh, James Duncan (CPSO#: 18628)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2002