McIntosh, Karen Leslie (CPSO#: 31566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501-1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 725-3117
Fax: (613) 725-3237
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LESLIE MCINTOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTOSH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1978 to 18 Jun 1979
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1980