McIntosh, Keith Steven (CPSO#: 86637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 61312
Fax: (519) 646-6130
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keith McIntosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McIntosh ( CPSO# 86637 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH STEVEN MCINTOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTOSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 02 Jan 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011