McIntyre, Brian George (CPSO#: 51106)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012