McIntyre, Heather Elyse (CPSO#: 96127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ELYSE MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014