McIntyre, Julie Jean (CPSO#: 51263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
90 Abbott Ave
Toronto ON  M6P 1H6
Phone: 416-254-6974
Fax: 416-767-9997
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: As of January 1, 2015, patients looking to obtain their medical records may contact: Dr. Gillian Lindzon 2760 Yonge Street Toronto ON M4N 2J2 Phone: 416-481-1173 Fax: 416-481-7431
Date Received: 16 Dec 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE JEAN MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1984