McIntyre, McKyla Hera (CPSO#: 106802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Rehab Institute
Department of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: 416-885-1660
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MCKYLA HERA MCINTYRE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MCINTYRE is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MCINTYRE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MCINTYRE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MCINTYRE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MCINTYRE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MCINTYRE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018