McIntyre, Paul Francis (CPSO#: 67531)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1993 to 30 Sep 1994
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1995