McIntyre, R. Alan (CPSO#: 51107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109 Centre Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4V6
Phone: (905) 665-6886
Fax: (905) 665-6355
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. R. ALAN MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1987