McIsaac, Warren Joseph (CPSO#: 52917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor P O Box 25
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-3190
Fax: (416) 586-3175
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Warren McIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. McIsaac ( CPSO# 52917 )

Business Address:
Granovsky Gluskin Family Medicine Centre
60 Murray Street
Box 25 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-3190

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN JOSEPH MCISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCISAAC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1985