McIvor, Robert Andrew (CPSO#: 63041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Firestone Institute for
Respiratory Health Room T2127
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34330
Fax: (905) 521-6183
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McIvor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McIvor ( CPSO# 63041 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Firestone Institute for Respiratory Health
Room T2127
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ANDREW MCIVOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCIVOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1990