McKaigney, John Patrick (CPSO#: 51165)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 03 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1998