McKay, Janet Elizabeth (CPSO#: 59604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
1634 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 5L7
Phone: (519) 472-7795
Fax: (519) 472-7816
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet McKay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKay ( CPSO# 59604 )

Business Address:
Suite 5
1634 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 472-7795

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1991