McKay, Jeffrey Peter (CPSO#: 108545)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2016 to 13 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Urology

University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2016 to 30 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2016