McKay, Robert (CPSO#: 58899)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010