McKay, Scott Douglas (CPSO#: 77557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Byron Family Medical Centre
1228 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone: (519) 472-9670
Fax: (519) 657-1766
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dearness Home
710 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 1R8
Canada
Phone: (519) 661-0400
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott D. McKay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McKay ( CPSO# 77557 )

Business Address:
Byron Family Medical Centre
1228 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone Number: (519) 472-9670

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT DOUGLAS MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004