Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McKay, Suzanne Joan (CPSO#: 55845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Casey Street
Box 760
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone: (613) 633-6528
Fax: (613) 756-3891
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Dec 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE JOAN MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2000 to 21 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986