McKechnie, Catherine Mary (CPSO#: 86639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
701 Rossland road
suite 6
Whitby ontario
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y9
Phone: (905) 493-3447
Fax: (905) 493-4303
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine McKechnie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McKechnie ( CPSO# 86639 )

Business Address:
701 Rossland Road East
Suite 6
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y9
Phone Number: (905) 493-3447

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY MCKECHNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKECHNIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009