McKechnie, Kyle Stuart (CPSO#: 81431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: (705) 671-5458
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyle McKechnie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McKechnie ( CPSO# 81431 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLE STUART MCKECHNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKECHNIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009