McKee, Alexander Carman (CPSO#: 56430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone: (613) 739-3459
Fax: (613) 739-1471
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alex C. McKee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McKee ( CPSO# 56430 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone Number: (613) 739-3459

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CARMAN MCKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 09 Sep 1985 to 05 Jan 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jan 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1986