McKee, John David (CPSO#: 69203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
500 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Phone: (705) 503-5355
Fax: (705) 503-5455
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John David McKee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKee ( CPSO# 69203 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
500 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Phone Number: (705) 503-5355

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID MCKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1997