McKee, Michael David (CPSO#: 56835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9303 N 58Th St
Paradise Valley AZ  85253
United States
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael McKee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McKee ( CPSO# 56835 )

Business Address:
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8500

Business Address:
800 - 55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5880

Business Address:
100 - 272 Richmond Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1P4
Phone Number: (416) 366-4686

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID MCKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987