McKee, Ryan William Charles (CPSO#: 90692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Family Medicine
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0023
Fax: (519) 783-0033
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Village of Winston Park
Long-Term Care Home
695 Block Line Road
Kitchener ON  N2E 3K1
Canada
Phone: 519-576-2430
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan McKee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McKee ( CPSO# 90692 )

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0020

Business Address:
695 Block Line Road
Kitchener ON  N2E 3K1
Phone Number: (519) 576-2430

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN WILLIAM CHARLES MCKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011