McKellar, Robert Gilbert (CPSO#: 23073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
212-840 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C5T2
Phone: 416-422-0899
Fax: 416-422-0666
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GILBERT MCKELLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKELLAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1970