McKelvie, Robert Samuel (CPSO#: 51166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care Center
Room B3-628
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: 519-646-6175
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert McKelvie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McKelvie ( CPSO# 51166 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Center
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6175

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6175

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT SAMUEL MCKELVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKELVIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1983