McKendry, Robert John Ralph (CPSO#: 26630)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Former patients of Dr. Robert J. R. McKendry may contact the Ottawa Hospital - Medical Records Department for medical record requests.
Date Received: 05 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 18 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015