McKenny, Michael James Paul (CPSO#: 99480)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 22 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014