McKenzie, Ernest John (CPSO#: 46658)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2013