McKenzie, Francis Neil (CPSO#: 28940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
PO Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3098
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil McKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. McKenzie ( CPSO# 28940 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
PO Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3098

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 07 Dec 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCIS NEIL MCKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1977