McKenzie, Jeffrey Scott (CPSO#: 76300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Court Medical Building
Suite LL2
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 735-1479
Fax: (705) 735-2869
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott McKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKenzie ( CPSO# 76300 )

Business Address:
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Lower Level 2
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 735-1479

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY SCOTT MCKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006