Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McKenzie, Kenneth Anthony (CPSO#: 55466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
86 Dawson Rd
Unit 3
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone: (519) 837-2020 Ext. 2
Fax: (519) 763-9871
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. A. McKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. McKenzie ( CPSO# 55466 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
86 Dawson Road
Unit 3
Guelph ON  N1H 1A8
Phone Number: (519) 837-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ANTHONY MCKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986