McKeown, Emily Jane (CPSO#: 86789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: Kovacs, Emily Jane (used until: 18 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite M1-400
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4580
Fax: (416) 480-4233
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

107-1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K2W1
Canada
Phone: 416-777-0004
Fax: 416 826 0009
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY JANE MCKEOWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKEOWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012