McKillop, Barry Allen (CPSO#: 27313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcare Hospital
DUBAI NOCODE
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 97144079120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY ALLEN MCKILLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKILLOP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975