McKillop, Scott Douglas (CPSO#: 73609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Douglas McKillop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McKillop ( CPSO# 73609 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 17 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT DOUGLAS MCKILLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKILLOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 14 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2006