McKim, Douglas Alan (CPSO#: 55528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Director Respiratory Rehabilitation
The Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75318
Fax: (613) 736-9054
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4636
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas McKim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McKim ( CPSO# 55528 )
Dr. S. McKim ( CPSO# 55841 )

Business Address:
Director Respiratory Rehabilitation
The Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Suite 1201
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Suite F195
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS ALAN MCKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1987