McKim, John Stewart (CPSO#: 12461)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1946

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1947
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Dec 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2002