McKinley, Marianne (CPSO#: 65935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: Mesaros, Marianne (used until: 03 Jan 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIANNE MCKINLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1992