McKinney, Martha Louise (CPSO#: 74201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Bowman Gray of Wake Forest University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHU - Sainte Justine
Pneumologie Pediatrie 6- 149
3175 Chemin de la Cote St Catherine
Montreal QC  H3T 1C5
Phone: (514) 345-4931 Ext. 5409
Fax: (514) 345-4804

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Quebec
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHA LOUISE MCKINNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 1999 to 22 Aug 1999
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004