McKinnon, Lynda Marie (CPSO#: 56909)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2007