McKinnon, Maxine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 28797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suites 301 and 302
53 Herriott Street
Perth ON  K7H 1T5
Phone: (613) 264-8585
Fax: (613) 267-2526
Electoral District: 07

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 15 Jun 1974 to 14 Jun 1975
Other - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Maxine Elizabeth McKinnon may practise medicine independently as a GP
            Psychotherapist, only.