McKnight, David James (CPSO#: 31134)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Michaels Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017