McKnight, Lisa Claire (CPSO#: 83818)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. McKnight's Saint John Regional Hospital 3DN Suite D P O Box 2100 Saint John, New Brunswick E2L 4L2
Date Received: 24 Aug 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 07 Nov 2005 to 04 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 05 Dec 2005 to 16 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 2011