McKnight, Robert Alvin (CPSO#: 43107)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 28 Feb 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 Feb 1996

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Feb 1996
Summary:

 On February 28, 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. McKnight guilty of professional 
 misconduct, as defined in s. 1(1)(34) of Ontario Regulation 856/93, as amended, in that he engaged 
 in conduct unbecoming a physician; and as defined in s. 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions 
 Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, as amended, in 
 that he had been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice.  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. McKnight's licence to practice be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 28, 1996